• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

GCSE Maths Coursework Module 4 Number grid

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

-GCSE Maths Coursework Module 4 Number grid 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 89 90 91 92 93 94 95 96 97 98 99 100 * A box is drawn round four numbers * Find the product of the top left number and the bottom right number in the box * Do the same with the top right and bottom left numbers * Calculate the difference between these products Investigate further. For my module 4 coursework, I have been given the above investigation to carry out. The grid size is 10 x 10 and the box inside is 2 x 2. The box covers four numbers where I have been instructed to find the product of the top left number and the bottom right number as well as the top right number and the bottom left number. ...read more.

Middle

an r x r box on a 10 x 10 grid: R X R box within a grid 10 numbers across: n n + 1 . . . n + r - 1 . . . n + 10 n + 1 +10 . . . n + r - 1 + 10 . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . n + 10(r - 1) = n + 10r - 10 n + 1 + 10(r - 1) . . . n + r - 1 + 10(r - 1) = N + 11r - 11 . . . From this R x R box I have obtained the equation from the product of top right and bottom left: (n + 10r - 10) x (n + r - 1) I then expanded the brackets and eventually getting an expression containing six terms: n2 + 11nr - 11n + 10r2 - 20r + 10 (Equation 1) I then took the top left and bottom right and multiplied them together: n (n + 11r - 11) = n2 + 11nr - 11n (Equation 2) ...read more.

Conclusion

From the r X s box I the bottom left and top right and multiplied them together: (n + gs - g) x (n + r - 1) I then expanded these brackets to get 9 terms: n2 + nr - n + gsn + gsr - gs - gn - gr + g (Equation 1) Now I took the top left and bottom right and multiply these together: n (n + r + gs - g - 1) = n2 + nr + gsn - gn - n (Equation 2) If then (Equation 2) away from (Equation 1) and simplified it to get: gsr - gs - gr + g g(sr - s - r + 1) The expression in brackets again factorises so I now got: = g (r - 1)(s - 1) Here I have got the equation for the grid size. And changing numbers around will get you different results with this equation. If g=10 this formula becomes the same as the one calculated for the r x s box within a grid 10 numbers across. If g=10 and r=s this formula becomes the same as the one calculated for the r x r box within a grid 10 numbers across. ?? ?? ?? ?? ...read more.

The above preview is unformatted text

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. GCSE Maths Sequences Coursework

    Total Squares 3n�+3n+1 I will now do a check to see if my formulae are correct.

  2. Number Grid Coursework

    Product 2 (TR x BL) Difference (P'duct 2 - P'duct 1) 3 207 567 360 11 847 1207 360 23 2047 2407 360 31 3007 3367 360 34 3400 3760 360 4) Data Analysis From tables (a)-(e), it is possible to see that all the differences of the products tested are multiples of 10.

  1. Number Grids Investigation Coursework

    D = wp2 (m - 1) (n - 1) (w = 8) (m = 4) (n = 5) (p = 3) = 8 x 32 (4 - 1) (5 - 1) = 8 x 9 x 3 x 4 = 864 I will draw an example of this rectangle in the same grid to check this

  2. Investigate the number of winning lines in the game Connect 4.

    board the total number of winning lines=h - 3. I then decided to alter the width of the grid, instead of constantly keeping it at 1 square I decide to increase it by 1 square on each separate grid. However I still only drew on the winning vertical lines.

  1. Number Grid Investigation.

    5 X 4 taken from multiples of 5 grid: 20 25 30 35 40 70 75 80 85 90 120 125 130 135 140 170 175 180 185 190 5� = 25. 25Z(n-1)(d-1) 250(5-1)(4-1) = 3000. This is correct. 5 X 4 taken from multiples of 7 grid: 28 35

  2. algebra coursework

    = Z� + 13Z (Z+3) (Z+10) = Z� +10Z +3Z +30 = Z� +13Z +30 Z� +13Z +30 - Z� + 13Z = 30 Ex 9 3 X 4 rectangle on a 10 X 10 grid 71 72 73 74 81 82 83 84 91 92 93 94 71 X 94 = 6674 91 X 74

  1. Number grid Investigation

    x 32 = 1536 1536 - 1500 = 36 The difference is 36. 57 58 59 66 67 68 75 76 77 57 x 77 = 4389 75 x 59 = 4425 4425 - 4389 = 36 The difference is still 36.

  2. Investigate the product of the top left number and the bottom right number of ...

    Column A shows the difference between the answers to each sum. Column B shows the increase from the answers to the sums in column A. BOX SIZE a b 2 X 2 10 30 3 X 3 40 50 4 X 4 90 70 5 X 5 160 90 6

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work