• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

Maths - Number grid.

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

Planning What is your task about? What do you have to do? My task is to take a number grid, draw a square around four numbers, and work out the product of the top left corner and bottom right corner. I am to do the same for the top right and bottom left corner. I must then work out the formula for my calculations so it can apply to any four numbers in a square on that size grid. Have you got any questions you would like to add to the original tasks? After each section of results I will do an Analysis of my results to look for any kind of relationship forming. What will you do first? To begin with I will plan my results table and then begin work on my task analysis. What information or data will you need to collect in order to complete the task? The information I need to collect is the product of the top right and bottom left numbers in a two-by-two square on a ten-by-ten number grid. I will also need to find the product of the top right and bottom left numbers. I will then use these numbers to calculate an nth term. How much information do you think you will need to collect? I will need to take 3, 4 or 5 readings (depending on grid size) ...read more.

Middle

99 100 Numbers Top Left x Bottom Right Top Right x Bottom Left Difference 1, 2, 11, 12 1 x 12 = 12 2 x 11 = 22 10 26, 27, 36, 37 26 x 37 = 962 27 x 36 = 972 10 58, 59, 68, 69 58 x 69 = 4002 59 x 68 = 4012 10 73, 74, 83, 84 73 x 84 = 6132 74 x 83 = 6142 10 89, 90, 99, 100 89 x 100 = 8900 90 x 99 = 8910 10 n, n + 1, n + 10, n + 11 n(n + 11) = n2 + 11n (n + 1)(n + 10) = n2 + 11n + 10 10 1.2 - Seven-by-Seven Grid, Two-by-Two Square 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 Numbers Top Left x Bottom Right Top Right x Bottom Left Difference 1, 2, 8, 9 1 x 9 = 9 2 x 8 = 16 7 12, 13, 19, 20 12 x 20 = 240 13 x 19 = 247 7 25, 26, 32, 33 25 x 33 = 825 26 x 32 = 832 7 30, 31, 37, 38 30 x 38 = 1140 31 x 37 ...read more.

Conclusion

1, 3, 15, 17 1 x 17 = 17 3 x 15 = 45 28 4, 6, 18, 20 4 x 20 = 80 6 x 18 = 108 28 23, 25, 37, 39 23 x 39 = 897 25 x 37 = 925 28 33, 35, 47, 49 33 x 49 = 1617 35 x 47 = 1645 28 n, n + 2, n + 14, n + 16 n(n + 16) = n2 + 16n (n + 2)(n + 14) = n2 + 16n + 28 28 2.3 - Five-by-Five Grid, Three-by-Three Square 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 Numbers Top Left x Bottom Right Top Right x Bottom Left Difference 1, 3, 11, 13 1 x 13 = 13 3 x 11 = 33 20 13, 15, 23, 25 13 x 25 = 325 15 x 23 = 345 20 n, n + 2, n + 10, n + 12 n(n + 12) = n2 + 12n (n + 2)(n + 10) = n2 + 12n + 20 20 Results Analysis Two In this set of results I have realised that the difference between the two products is 4 times the grid size, i.e. on a 7x7 grid, with a 3x3 square, the difference will be 4x7. On a 5x5 grid with a 3x3 square, the difference will be 4x5. ...read more.

The above preview is unformatted text

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. Investigation of diagonal difference.

    1 1 + (3 - 1) = 3 1 + ((2 - 1) 10) = 11 1 + ((2 - 1)10) + (3-1) = 13 => The solutions give the correct final products and the corner values are the same as the corner values of a 2 x 3 cutout on a 10 x 10 grid.

  2. Algebra Investigation - Grid Square and Cube Relationships

    This means the algebraic equation should be: Difference: (5x2x2)-(5x2)-(5x2)+5 = 5 Therefore, the formula gained has been proven to be correct and valid for calculating the difference. 6 x 6 Grid 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19

  1. Maths - number grid

    - s(s+55) s(s+48) +7 (s+48) - s - 55s s +48s +7s +336 - s - 55s =336 As can be seen the only trend within this part of my investigation is that all my results for each rectangle is a multiple of 12.

  2. number grid

    The Difference for any 4 X 4 grid is always 90 inside a 10 X 10 grid. 5 X 5 Grid Now I will look at 5 X 5 grids within a 10 X 10 grid. Again I will work this out algebraically.

  1. Mathematical Coursework: 3-step stairs

    31 21 22 11 12 13 1 2 3 4 The 4 step stairs are similar to the 3-step stairs only it varies a step thus meaning it will go up by another 10. N+30 N+20 N+21 N+10 N+11 N+12 N N+1 N+2 N+3 I predicted that as the steps go higher the number adds another 10.

  2. 100 Number Grid

    55 x 99 = 5445 59 x 95 = 5605 Product difference = 160 These results suggest that for every 5 x 5 square, the product difference will be 160. Using the following algebraic equation, I will prove that this prediction is accurate.

  1. number grid investigation]

    Formula 1 Calculating a General Formula Using the Term 'n' The formulas stated above can also be used to calculate the general terms that would appear in a box with any selected top left number (n). To obtain the top right number, it is necessary to implement formula number 2

  2. number grid

    n+11 Stage A: Top left number x Bottom right number = n(n+11) = n2+11n Stage B: Bottom left number x Top right number = (n+10)(n+1)= n2+1n+10n+10 = n2+11n+10 Stage B - Stage A: (n2+11n+10)-(n2+11n) = 10 When finding the general formula for any number (n), both answers begin with the equation n2+11n, which signifies that they can be manipulated easily.

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work