• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

Number Grid.

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

Number Grid. Using the following rule: find the product of the top left and bottom right number in a square. Do the same thing with the bottom left and top right. Calculate the difference. Investigate. To start this investigation I used a number grid from which I could take a box out and use to find the differences. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 ...read more.

Middle

85 86 87 88 89 90 91 92 93 94 95 96 97 98 99 100 This grid contains one variable, The fact that the box, contained inside the grid is a square. For each example I will show that I worked out the differences both by using the existing maths I knew and by using a formula, which I devised. Existing Maths/Multiplication. 13 ? 22 = 286 12 ? ...read more.

Conclusion

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 57 58 59 60 For this example I used a 4 ? 4 square. This could be classed as changing a variable but it is not as it is changing the value of a variable. Multiplication 17 ? 44 = 748 14 ? 47 = 658 ...read more.

The above preview is unformatted text

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. Number Grid Investigation.

    My Final Tested Results. All the formulas now stated below have been tested using algebra and calculation somewhere in this investigation. 'z' => width of grid. 'n' => width of square within grid. 'd' => depth of square. For 2 X 2, 3 X 3, 4 X 4 etc...

  2. Maths - number grid

    These will be randomly selected from the new 12x12 number grid, my general aim being to establish an overall formula. I feel unable to make any predictions when investigating various rectangles. 48x68 - 44x72 3264 -3168 Difference = 96 77x97 -73x101 7469 -7373 Difference = 96 As can be seen

  1. Number Grid Investigation

    x 58= 986 Difference = 40 18 x 57= 1026 As I predicted the difference was 40, I will go on and prove this by using algebra. n n+1 n+10 n+11 n+20 n+21 n+30 n+31 n+40 n+41 n+1 x n+40 = n2+41n+40 Difference = 40 n x n+41 = n2+41n

  2. number grid

    - (a� + 44a) = 160 According to this, the difference between the product of the top left number and the bottom right number, and the product of the top right number and the bottom left number in any 5 X 5 grid inside a 10 X 10 grid will always be 160.

  1. number grid investigation]

    Although it is quite certain that this trend would be observed in all number boxes of this instance, it is necessary to find an algebraic formula to prove that the difference remains invariable. Any 2x2 square box on the 10x10 grid can be expressed in this way: n n+1 n+10

  2. number grid

    Although it is quite certain that this trend would be observed in all number boxes of this instance, it is necessary to find an algebraic formula to prove that the difference remains invariable. Any 3x3 square box on the 10x10 grid can be expressed in this way: n n+1 n+2

  1. Algebra Investigation - Grid Square and Cube Relationships

    n+10 n+11 n+12 n+20 n+21 n+22 Stage A: Top left number x Bottom right number = n(n+22) = n2+22n Stage B: Bottom left number x Top right number = (n+20)(n+2)= n2+2n+20n+40 = n2+22n+40 Stage B - Stage A: (n2+22n+40)-(n2+22n) = 40 When finding the general formula for any number (n),

  2. Number grid Investigation

    Then finding the difference. 4 5 6 14 15 16 24 25 26 I drew a box around nine numbers and then found the product of the top left number: 4 x 26 = 104 I then repeated this with the top right number and the bottom left number: 24

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work