• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month
Page
  1. 1
    1
  2. 2
    2
  3. 3
    3
  4. 4
    4
  5. 5
    5
  6. 6
    6
  7. 7
    7
  8. 8
    8
  9. 9
    9
  10. 10
    10
  11. 11
    11
  12. 12
    12
  13. 13
    13
  14. 14
    14
  15. 15
    15
  16. 16
    16
  17. 17
    17
  • Level: GCSE
  • Subject: Maths
  • Word count: 2920

Number Grid Coursework

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

Number Grid Coursework

1

 2

 3

 4

 5

 6

 7

 8

 9

 10

 11

 12

 13

 14

 15

 16

 17

 18

 19

 20

 21

 22

 23

 24

 25

 26

 27

 28

 29

 30

 31

 32

 33

 34

 35

 36

 37

 38

 39

 40

 41

 42

 43

 44

 45

 46

 47

 48

 49

 50

 51

 52

 53

 54

 55

 56

 57

 58

 59

 60

 61

 62

 63

 64

 65

 66

 67

 68

 69

 70

 71

 72

 73

 74

 75

 76

 77

 78

 79

 80

 81

 82

 83

 84

 85

 86

 87

 88

 89

 90

 91

 92

 93

 94

 95

 96

 97

 98

 99

100

  • A box is drawn around 4 Numbers
  • Find the product of the top left number and bottom right number in this box
  • Do the same with the top right and bottom left numbers
  • Calculate the difference between these products

For my piece of coursework as shown above I will need to work out the product of the numbers multiplied from the top left and bottom right numbers and the same with the top right and bottom left numbers and example is shown below:

To work out the Product I will need to multiply 12 by 23 and 13 by 22

12 x 23 = 276

To work out the difference I will

   need to subtract 286 from 276 :

13 x 22 = 286276 – 286 = 10

I will now start my coursework with a 10 x 10 grid and then develop it further by doing different shaped grids and sizes also I will show that my coursework is coming along successfully by working out the algebraic equation which should work for a certain sized grid.

10 x 10

1

2

3

4

5

6

7

8

9

10

11

12

13

14

15

16

17

18

19

20

21

22

23

24

25

26

27

28

29

30

31

32

33

34

35

36

37

38

39

40

41

42

43

44

45

46

47

48

49

50

51

52

53

54

55

56

57

58

59

60

61

62

63

64

65

66

67

68

69

70

71

72

73

74

75

76

77

78

79

80

81

82

83

84

85

86

87

88

89

90

91

92

93

94

95

96

97

98

99

100

2 x 2                                                      

12x23 = 276                                          

13x22 = 286                difference = 10                                                                                

64x75 = 4800                                        

65x74 = 4810        difference = 10            

38x49 = 1862                                        

39x48 = 1872        difference = 10

N

N+1

N+10

N+11


           

X = N x (N + 11) = (N x N) + (N + 11) = N² + 11N

Y = (N + 1) X (N + 10) = (N x N) + (N x 10) + (N x 1) + (1 x 10) = N² + 11N + 10

Both X and Y have N² + 11N

...read more.

Middle

DIFFERENCE

10

40

90

160

1st  DIFFERENCE

40-10=30            90-40=50        160-90=70

2nd DIFFERENCE

50-30=20             70-50=20

11 x 9

1

2

3

4

5

6

7

8

9

10

11

12

13

14

15

16

17

18

19

20

21

22

23

24

25

26

27

28

29

30

31

32

33

34

35

36

37

38

39

40

41

42

43

44

45

46

47

48

49

50

51

52

53

54

55

56

57

58

59

60

61

62

63

64

65

66

67

68

69

70

71

72

73

74

75

76

77

78

79

80

81

82

83

84

85

86

87

88

89

90

91

92

93

94

95

96

97

98

99

2 x 2

24x36 = 864

25x35 = 875                difference = 11

60x72 = 4320

61x71 = 4331        difference = 11

21x33 = 693

22x32 = 704                difference = 11

N

N+1

N+11

N+12

X = N x (N + 12) = (N x N) + (N x 12) = N² + 12N

Y = (N+1) x (N + 11) = (N x N) + (N x 11) + (N x1) + (1 x 11) = N² + 12N + 11

3 x 3

27x51 = 1377

29x49 = 1421                difference = 44

67x91 = 6097

69x89 = 6141                difference = 44

N

N+1

N+2

N+11

N+12

N+13

N+22

N+23

N+24

X = N x (N + 24) = (N x N) + (N x 24) = N² + 24N

Y = (N + 2) x (N + 22) = (N x N) + (N x 22) + (N x 2) + (2 x 22) = N² + 24N + 44

4 x 4

14x50 = 700

17x47 = 799                        difference = 99

51x87 = 4437

54x84 = 4536                difference = 99

N

N+1

N+2

N+3

N+11

N+12

N+13

N+14

N+22

N+23

N+24

N+25

N+33

N+34

N+35

N+36

X = N x (N + 36) = (N x N) + (N x 36) = N² + 36N

Y = (N + 3) + (N + 33) = (N x N) + (N x 33) + (N x 3) + (3 x 33) = N² + 36N + 99


5 x 5

17x65 = 1105

21x61  = 1281                difference = 176

47x95 = 4465

51x91 = 4641                difference = 176

N

N+1

N+2

N+3

N+4

N+11

N+12

N+13

N+14

N+15

N+22

N+23

N+24

N+25

N+26

N+33

N+34

N+35

N+36

N+34

N+44

N+45

N+46

N+47

N+48

X = N x ( N + 48) = (N x N) + (N x 48) = N ² + 48N

Y = (N + 4) x (N + 44) = (N x N) + (N x 44) + (N x 4) + (4 x 44) = N² + 48N + 176

-- I will now attempt to work out the difference of a grid (8 x 8) without doing the multiplication before hand to test my equation--

N

N+1

N+2

N+3

N+4

N+5

N+22

N+23

N+24

N+25

N+26

N+27

N+33

N+34

N+35

N+36

N+37

N+38

N+44

N+45

N+46

N+47

N+48

N+49

N+55

N+56

N+57

N+58

N+59

N+60

N+66

N+67

N+68

N+69

N+70

N+71

X = N x (N + 71) = (N x N) + (N x 71) = N² + 71N

Y = (N + 5) x (N + 55) = (N x N) + (N x 55) + (N x 5) + (6 x 55) = N² + 71N +275

From the equation I predict that the difference in the 8x8 grid will be 275

25x85 = 2125

30x80 = 2400        difference = 275

21x71 = 1491

16x76 = 1216         difference = 275

Below I have worked out the Nth term for all the grid sizes (2x2 – 5x5)                      

GRID

2x2

3x3

4x4

5x5

DIFFERENCE

11

44

99

176

1st  DIFFERENCE

44-11=33            99-44=55        176-99=77

2nd DIFFERENCE

55-33=22             77-55=22


8 x 9

1

2

3

4

5

6

7

8

9

10

11

12

13

14

15

16

17

18

19

20

21

22

23

24

25

26

27

28

29

30

31

32

33

34

35

36

37

38

39

40

41

42

43

44

45

46

47

48

49

50

51

52

53

54

55

56

57

58

59

60

61

62

63

64

65

66

67

68

69

70

71

72

2 x 2

19x28 = 532

20x27 = 540                difference = 8

52x61 = 3172

53x60 = 3180        difference = 8

N

N+1

N+8

N+9

X = N x (N + 9) = (N x N) + (N x 9) = N² + 9N

Y = (N + 1) x (N + 8) = (N x N) + (N x 8) + (N x 1) + (8 x 1) = N² + 9N + 8


3 x 3

42x60 = 2520

44x58 = 2552        difference = 32

21x39 = 819

23x37 = 851                difference = 32

N

N+1

N+2

N+8

N+9

N+10

N+16

N+17

N+18

...read more.

Conclusion

49x63 = 3087        difference = 120

N

N+1

N+2

N+3

N+4

N+5

N+6

N+10

N+11

N+12

N+13

N+14

N+15

N+16

N+20

N+21

N+22

N+23

N+24

N+25

N+26

X= N x (N + 26) = (N x N) + (N x 26) = N² + 26N

Y = (N + 6) + (N + 20) = (N x N) + (N x 20) + (N x 6) + (6 x 20) = N² + 26N + 120

-- I will now attempt to work out the difference of a grid (3 x 8) without doing the multiplication before hand to test my equation--

N

N+1

N+2

N+3

N+4

N+5

N+6

N+7

N+10

N+11

N+12

N+13

N+14

N+15

N+16

N+17

N+20

N+21

N+22

N+23

N+24

N+25

N+26

N+27

X = N x (N + 27) = (N x N) + (N x 27) = N² + 27N

Y = (N + 7) + (N + 20) = (N x N) + (N x 20) + (N x 7) + (7 x 20) = N² + 27N + 140

From the equation I predict that the difference in the 3x8 grid will be 140


3 x 8

12x39 = 468

19x32 = 608                difference = 140

42x69 = 2898

49x62 = 3038        difference = 140

Below I have worked out the Nth term for all the grid sizes (3x4 – 3x7)                      

GRID

3x4

3x5

3x6

3x7

DIFFERENCE

60

80

100

120

Divide by 10

        6                     8                     10                     12

Multiples

      2x3                 2x4                 2x5                   2x6                            

I can now use these to work out a general rule for rectangle grids on a

10 x 10 Grid.

Grid

3 x 4

3 x 5

3 x 6

3 x 7

Width – 1

3 – 1 = 2

3 – 1 = 2

3 – 1 = 2

3 – 1 = 2

Length – 1

4 – 1 = 3

5 – 1 = 4

6 – 1 = 5

7 – 1 = 6

Length x Width x 10

3 x 2 x 10 = 60

2 x 4 x 10 = 80

2 x 5 x 10 = 100

2 x 6 x 10 = 120

I have worked out a rule for the rectangular grid which seems to work

10 x (L – 1) (W - 1)

Zuhaib Ahmad

...read more.

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. Marked by a teacher

    Mathematics Coursework: problem solving tasks

    3 star(s)

    of rows + 1 Tile + 2 tile + 3 tile + 4 Tile + 5 Tile +6 tile 6 T 4 4 4 4 4 4 6 L 10 12 14 16 18 20 6 + 0 5 10 15 20 25 Over Arching Solution Finding a formula for any tile arrangement made up from square numbers proved successful.

  2. Number Grid Coursework

    Product 2 (TR x BL) Difference (P'duct 2 - P'duct 1) 6 234 324 90 35 2380 2470 90 55 4840 4930 90 57 5130 5220 90 62 5890 5980 90 c) Here are the results of the 5 calculations for 5x5 Box on Width 10 Grid: Top-Left Number Product 1 (TL x BR)

  1. Number Grids Investigation Coursework

    (pn - p) (w = 10) (m = 2) (n = 2) (p = 2) = 10 (4 - 2) (4 - 2) = 10 x 4 x 4 = 40 So I have found a formula that covers every one of the variables I have looked at, the width

  2. Investigation of diagonal difference.

    examples of different size cutouts and look to see if there are any patterns or relationships between them. Hopefully by the end of this analysis I will have found a general formula for which I can work out the diagonal difference for any size, square cutout on any size, square grid.

  1. Maths - number grid

    My formula for squares was 10(r -1) My formula for rectangles was 10(s -1)(r - 1). I notice that the number 10 appears in both formulas and the reason I think this has happened might be because the squares and rectangles I used were selected from the provided 10x10 grid.

  2. algebra coursework

    Z+2 = 48 +2 = 50 (top right number) Z+20 = 48 +20 = 68 (bottom left number) Z+22= 48 +22 = 70 (bottom right number) Z (Z+22) = Z� + 22Z (Z+2) (Z+20) = Z� + 20Z +2Z +40 = Z� + 22Z + 40 Z� + 22Z +

  1. number grid

    But this time instead of drawing all the grids I will try to work is out algebraically. I will do this because it will save time and get to the point quicker. Now I will pick out a 3 X 3 grid from a 10 X 10 and examine it

  2. Mathematical Coursework: 3-step stairs

    Therefore I will take the pattern number of the total: > 50-6=44 > b= 44 To conclusion my new formula would be: > 6n+44 However as you can see we haven't found out what the value of N is. Which is an important factor in the equation, otherwise the algebraic equation wouldn't allow me find the total number.

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work