• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month
Page
  1. 1
    1
  2. 2
    2
  3. 3
    3
  4. 4
    4
  5. 5
    5
  6. 6
    6
  7. 7
    7
  8. 8
    8
  9. 9
    9
  10. 10
    10
  11. 11
    11
  12. 12
    12
  13. 13
    13
  14. 14
    14
  15. 15
    15
  16. 16
    16
  17. 17
    17
  18. 18
    18
  19. 19
    19
  20. 20
    20
  21. 21
    21
  22. 22
    22
  23. 23
    23
  24. 24
    24
  25. 25
    25
  26. 26
    26
  27. 27
    27
  28. 28
    28
  29. 29
    29
  30. 30
    30
  31. 31
    31
  32. 32
    32
  33. 33
    33
  34. 34
    34
  35. 35
    35
  36. 36
    36
  37. 37
    37
  38. 38
    38
  39. 39
    39
  40. 40
    40
  41. 41
    41
  42. 42
    42
  43. 43
    43
  • Level: GCSE
  • Subject: Maths
  • Word count: 6080

Number grid Investigation

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

image00.png

1

2

3

4

5

6

7

8

9

10

11

12

13

14

15

16

17

18

19

20

21

22

23

24

25

26

27

28

29

30

31

32

33

34

35

36

37

38

39

40

41

42

43

44

45

46

47

48

49

50

51

52

53

54

55

56

57

58

59

60

61

62

63

64

65

66

67

68

69

70

71

72

73

74

75

76

77

78

79

80

81

82

83

84

85

86

87

88

89

90

91

92

93

94

95

96

97

98

99

100

For my coursework on investigation I have chosen to use a number grid. From the grid I will draw a box around a selected amount of numbers I will then find the product of the top left number and the bottom right number this will be repeated with the top right number and the bottom left number. When this is completed I will then find the difference between the two numbers.During this process I will be looking for patterns in and relationships between the differences that I collect.

The grid that I have started with is numbered from 1 to 100 with ten in each row and ten in each column.

image01.png

image10.png

12image21.png

13

22

23

I drew a box around four numbers and then found the product of the top left number:

12 x 23 = 276

I then repeated this with the top right number and the bottom left number:

13 x 22 =286

On completion of this I found the difference:

286 - 276 = 10

I repeated this process four times with other numbers from the grid to see if the difference would change.

62image21.png

63

72

73

62 x 73 = 4526

63 x 72 = 4536

4536 – 4526 = 10

The difference is still 10.

67image21.png

68

77

78

67 x 78 = 5226

77 x 68 = 5236

5236 – 5226 = 10

The difference is still 10

59image21.png

60

69

70

59 x 70 = 4130

 69 x 60 = 4140

4140 – 4130 = 10

The difference is always 10

After proving and verifying 4 times that 2x2 box in a 10x10 grid difference is 10, I was curious as to what would happen if I changed the size of the box. Therefore I chose to change the box from 2 x 2, (four numbers,) to 3 x 3, (nine numbers,) and used the same process of finding the product of the top left number and bottom right number and vice versa. Then finding the difference.

image31.png

4image02.png

5

6

14

15

16

24

25

26

I drew a box around nine numbers and then found the product of the top left number:

4 x 26 = 104

I then repeated this with the top right number and the bottom left number:

24 x 6 = 144

144 – 104 = 40

Then I found the difference of 40:

...read more.

Middle

48

49

50

30 x 50 = 1500

48 x 32 = 1536

1536 – 1500 = 36

The difference is 36.

57

58

59

66

67

68

75

76

77

57 x 77 = 4389

75 x 59 = 4425

4425 – 4389 = 36

The difference is still 36.

55

56

57

64

65

66

73

74

75

55 x 75 = 4125        

73 x 54 = 3942

4125 – 3942 = 36

The difference is always 36 in a 3 x3 box.

After proving and verifying 4 times that 3x3 box in a 9x9 grid difference is 36, I was curious as to what would happen if I changed the size of the box again. Therefore I chose to change the box from 3 x 3, (nine numbers,) to 4 x 4, (sixteen numbers,) and used the same process of finding the product of the top left number and bottom right number and vice versa. Then finding the difference.

image13.png

I drew a box around sixteen numbers and then found the product of the top left number:

1

2

3

4

10

11

12

13

19

20

21

22

28

29

30

31

1 x 31 = 31        

I then repeated this with the top right number and the bottom left number:

28 x 4 = 112

112 – 31 = 81

Then I found the difference of 81

I repeated this process four times with other numbers from the grid to see if the difference would change.

5

6

7

8

14

15

16

17

23

24

25

26

32

33

34

35

5 x 35 = 175

32 x 8 = 256        

256 – 175 = 81

The difference is 81.

40

41

42

43

49

50

51

52

58

59

60

61

67

68

69

70

40 x 70 = 2800

67 x 43 = 2881        

2881 – 2800 = 81

The difference is still 81.

46

47

48

49

55

56

57

58

64

65

66

67

73

74

75

76

46 x 76 = 3496

73 x 49 = 3577        

3577 – 3496= 81

The difference is always 81 in a 4 x 4 box.

After proving and verifying 4 times that 4x4 box in a 9x9 grid difference is 81, I was curious as to what would happen if I changed the size of the box again. Therefore I chose to change the box from 4 x 4, (sixteen numbers,) to 5 x 5, (twenty-five numbers,) and used the same process of finding the product of the top left number and bottom right number and vice versa. Then finding the difference.

image14.png

I drew a box around twenty-five numbers and then found the product of the top left number:

4 x 44 = 176        

4

5

6

7

8

13

14

15

16

17

22

23

24

25

26

31

32

33

34

35

40

41

42

43

44

I then repeated this with the top right number and the bottom left number:

40 x 8 = 320

320 – 176 = 144

Then I found the difference of 144.

I repeated this process four times with other numbers from the grid to see if the difference would change.

39

40

41

42

43

48

49

50

51

52

57

58

59

60

61

66

67

68

69

70

75

76

77

78

79

39 x 79 = 3081

75 x 43 = 3225

3225 – 3081 = 144

The difference is 144.

1

2

3

4

5

10

11

12

13

14

19

20

21

22

23

28

29

30

31

32

37

38

39

40

41

1 x 41 = 41

37 x 5 = 185

185 – 41 = 144

The difference is still 144.

5

6

7

8

9

14

15

16

17

18

23

24

25

26

27

32

33

34

35

36

41

42

43

44

45

5 x 45 = 225

41 x 9 = 369        

369 – 225 = 144

The difference is always 144 in a 5x5 box.

After proving and verifying 4 times that 5x5 box in a 9x9 grid difference is 144, I was curious as to what would happen if I changed the size of the box again. Therefore I chose to change the box from 5 x 5, (twenty-five numbers,) to6 x 6, (thirty-six numbers,) and used the same process of finding the product of the top left number and bottom right number and vice versa. Then finding the difference.

image15.png

31

32

33

34

35

36

40

41

42

43

44

45

49

50

51

52

53

54

58

59

60

61

62

63

67

68

69

70

71

72

76

77

78

79

80

81

I drew a box around thirty-six numbers and then found the product of the top left number:

31 x 81 = 2511        

I then repeated this with the top right number and the bottom left number:

36 x 76 = 2736

2736 – 2511 = 225

Then I found the difference of 225.

I repeated this process four times with other numbers from the grid to see if the difference would change.

28

29

30

31

32

33

37

38

39

40

41

42

46

47

48

49

50

51

55

56

57

58

59

60

64

65

66

67

68

69

73

74

75

76

77

78

28 x 78 = 2184        

73 x 33 = 2409

2409 – 2184 = 225

The difference is 225.

3

4

5

6

7

8

12

13

14

15

16

17

21

22

23

24

25

26

30

31

32

33

34

35

39

40

41

42

43

44

48

49

50

51

52

53

3 x 53 = 159

48 x 8 = 384

384 – 159 = 225

The difference is still 225.

12

13

14

15

16

17

21

22

23

24

25

26

30

31

32

33

34

35

39

40

41

42

43

44

48

49

50

51

52

53

57

58

59

60

61

62

12 x 62 = 744

17 x 57 = 969

969 – 744 = 225

The difference is always 225 in a 6 x 6 box.                                                                                                                                                                

My formula worked on my prediction and I got the right difference.  

n

2x2

3x3

4x4

5x5

6x6

9

36

81

144

225

Now I will try a 15 by 15 grid and see if the formula will change.

image16.png

1

2

3

4

5

6

7

8

9

10

11

12

13

14

15

16

17

18

19

20

21

22

23

24

25

26

27

28

29

30

31

32

33

34

35

36

37

38

39

40

41

42

43

44

45

46

47

48

49

50

51

52

53

54

55

56

57

58

59

60

61

62

63

64

65

66

67

68

69

70

71

72

73

74

75

76

77

78

79

80

81

82

83

84

85

86

87

88

89

90

91

92

93

94

95

96

97

98

99

100

101

102

103

104

105

106

107

108

109

110

111

112

113

114

115

116

117

118

119

120

121

122

123

124

125

126

127

128

129

130

131

132

133

134

135

136

137

138

139

140

141

142

143

144

145

146

147

148

149

150

151

152

153

154

155

156

157

158

159

160

161

162

163

164

165

166

167

168

169

170

171

172

173

174

175

176

177

178

179

180

181

182

183

184

185

186

187

188

189

190

191

192

193

194

195

196

197

198

199

200

201

202

203

204

205

206

207

208

209

210

211

212

213

214

215

216

217

218

219

220

221

222

223

224

225

I will try different square box inside the 15 by 15 grid like I did in the 10 by 10 grids and see if the formula would change or work.

image17.png

I drew a box around four numbers and then found the product of the top left number:

51 x 37 = 1887        

36

37

51

52

I then repeated this with the top right number and the bottom left number:

36 x 52 = 1872

1887 – 1872 = 15

Then I found the difference of 15.

I repeated this process four times with other numbers from the grid to see if the difference would change.

129

130

144

145

144 x 130 = 18720 ...read more.

Conclusion

N being the width of the square within grid

D being the depth of square.

So……

10(5-1) (3-1) = 80

Using the formula the difference should be 80. lets see if it is correct.

46 x 94 = 4324

54 x 86 = 4644

4644 – 4324 = 320

The formula is not correct so I will try a 4 x 3 square.

88

90

92

94

108

110

112

114

128

130

132

134

Z (n-1) (d-1)

10(4-1) (3-1) = 60

Using the formula the difference should be 80. Let’s see if it is correct.                        The formulas

88 x 134 = 11792image29.png

94 x 128 = 12032

12032 – 11792 = 240

It’s not correct again.

Both times I’ve tested my formula I noticed that the difference is 4 times the amount of the results taken from formula 2.

Therefore the formula must be:

4z (n-1) (d-1)

Let’s try it on a 5 x 4 square.

4 x 10 (5-1) (

4

6

8

10

12

24

26

28

30

32

44

46

48

50

52

64

66

68

70

72

4-1) = 480

Let’s see if it is correct.

4 x 72 = 288

12 x 64 = 768

768 – 288 = 480

This is correct.

In the one above they were multiples of 2 the formula was 4z(n-1) (d-1) the multiple number 2², is squared to give 4z.

I predict in a grid of 10 by 10 with multiples of 3, the formula will be

9z (n-1) (d-1)

Because 3² is 9

Let’s see if it is correct in a 5 x 4 square.

9 x 10 (5-1) (4-1) = 1080

12 x 114 = 1368

24 x 102 = 2448

2448 – 1368 = 1080

My prediction is right and so is the formula.

image30.png

In conclusion to my project I think I handled really well. I have presented my results and formulas in an appropriate way. I have challenged my thought by using predictions throughout the experiment and tested them. I have used algebra where necessary to prove why the formulas or calculations have worked out in the way that they have. Unfortunately I have not been able to present my results in any form chart but I have used tables and number patterns to make my results easier to understand. If I were to extend this project further I would have gathered a large set of formulas and results and gone into greater depth with my approaches carried out. This could prove difficulty as presenting it in an interesting way would cause great problems.

                                        By Kristi Sylari

...read more.

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. Number Grid Coursework

    is the bottom-left number in the box, because it is always "10 multiplied by [q - 1]" more than a; (a + 10[q - 1] + [p - 1]) is the bottom-right number in the box, because it is always "10 times [q - 1]" plus "[p - 1]" more than a.

  2. Number Grid Investigation.

    Increase My prediction suggests the nth term formula is 9n�. E.g. * 3rd term - 9 x 3� = 81 (correct - see T.5. 4x4 ) * 5th term - 9 x 5� = 225 (correct - see T.5 6x6)

  1. Investigation of diagonal difference.

    is n + 2G, and the bottom right is n + 2G + 2. So now that I have discovered this common factor in the cutouts I can now implement further algebra, but before I do this I must see weather or not my findings are true by looking at the corner values of a further cutout.

  2. Number Grids Investigation Coursework

    Table of Results for Rectangles My next job is to put all my results for rectangles in a table, to look for potential patterns and formulae. Length of Rectangle (m) Width of Rectangle (n) Difference (D) 2 2 10 2 3 20 2 4 30 2 5 40 Obviously, the

  1. Algebra Investigation - Grid Square and Cube Relationships

    Because the second answer has +90 at the end, it demonstrates that no matter what number is chosen to begin with (n), a difference of 90 will always be present. 5 x 5 Grid Prediction I believe that this difference of 160 should be expected to remain constant for all 5x5 number boxes.

  2. Step-stair Investigation.

    as this remains the same it means that there will always be a triangle number at the total for each row. I then realised that by adding T1 to T4 together it gives the total 20. This is the number that occurs in the formula for a 5-step stair in the form of 20g+20.

  1. Number Grid Investigation.

    34 35 36 42 43 44 45 46 52 53 54 55 56 62 63 64 65 66 (TL X BR) - (TR X BL) (22 X 66) - (26 X 62) = 160. The formula has proven to be correct.

  2. Maths - number grid

    46x67 3102 - 3082 Difference = 20 As can be seen, whether the rectangle is horizontal or vertical the outcome is the same. Because the outcome is the same I am going to concentrate on horizontal rectangles only. I am now going to use algebra to prove my defined difference of 20 is correct when using 3x2 rectangles.

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work