• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

Number Grid

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

N ATWELL-MANSINGH

GCSE MATHS

COURSE WORK

Number Grid

1

2

3

4

5

6

7

8

9

10

11

12

13

14

15

16

17

18

19

20

21

22

23

24

25

26

27

28

29

30

31

32

33

34

35

36

37

38

39

40

41

42

43

44

45

46

47

48

49

50

51

52

53

54

55

56

57

58

59

60

61

62

63

64

65

66

67

68

69

70

71

72

73

74

75

76

77

78

70

80

81

82

83

84

85

86

87

88

89

90

91

92

93

94

95

96

97

98

90

100

                                        Fig. A

To solve this problem I have broken down the table as much as possible starting with the first query given in the problem.

Ex (1) first box

Highlighted box: the product of the top right hand number and the bottom left hand

number minus the product of the top left hand number and the bottom right hand number

2*13= 26

12*3= 36

36-26= 10

Ex (2) second box

45*56=2520

55*46= 2530

2530-2520= 10

The product of the top right hand number and the bottom left hand number in each      square of numbers minus the product of the top left hand number

...read more.

Middle

I tried using the formula for what I have found before in table Fig. B below but this time I added more columns to the problem

1

2

3

4

5

6

7

8

9

10

11

12

13

14

15

16

17

18

19

20

21

22

23

24

25

26

27

28

29

30

31

32

33

34

35

36

37

38

39

40

41

42

43

44

45

46

47

48

49

50

51

52

53

54

55

56

57

58

59

60

61

62

63

64

65

66

67

68

69

70

71

72

73

74

75

76

77

78

70

80

81

82

83

84

85

86

87

88

89

90

91

92

93

94

95

96

97

98

90

100

                                        Fig. B    

The first column grid only 7 columns were highlighted and the following was taken into consideration

6 first number is n

7 the second number is n +1

By trying to find the formula for the number of columns used I introduced c in the formula

Therefore when 7 columns were used

The number below n =n+c

The number next to is as  n +c=1

...read more.

Conclusion

Investigation 1:

The product of any square regardless of it’s location in the grid is 10.

Investigation 2:

n+c+1 (c being the number of columns) the answer is always equal to the number of columns used in the grid.

Investigation 3:

The total of numbers in the top row of a grid subtract the total of numbers below is always equal to the number of columns used in the grid multiply by ten (10) which is the product of any square.

In conclusion I found that the general formula for a grid with c columns multiply by the general formula in a square is equal to the sum of numbers in the grid square and grid column.

...read more.

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. Number Grid Investigation.

    99 102 105 108 111 114 117 120 5 X 4 square taken from above. 12 15 18 21 24 42 45 48 51 54 72 75 78 81 84 102 105 108 111 114 (12 X 114) - (24 X 102) = 1080. 9Z (n-1)(d-1) 90 (5-1)(4-1) = 1080.

  2. Open Box Problem.

    2530 315111500 236 528 2528 315009024 237 526 2526 314896212 238 524 2524 314773088 239 522 2522 314639676 240 520 2520 314496000 241 518 2518 314342084 242 516 2516 314177952 243 514 2514 314003628 244 512 2512 313819136 245 510 2510 313624500 246 508 2508 313419744 247 506 2506 313204892

  1. Algebra Investigation - Grid Square and Cube Relationships

    follow certain, and constant sets of rules, which demonstrates confirmation of a pattern. The bottom right number in the rectangle is directly linked to the top right and bottom left numbers. It is the sum of these that equal the bottom right, or: Formula 1: Bottom Right (BR)

  2. Maths Grid Investigation

    55 x 64 = 3520 50 x 57 = 2850 56 x 63 = 3528 2850 - 2842 = 8 3528 - 3520 = 8 When we use a 2 x 2 grid inside a 8 x 8 grid we find that when you multiply the opposite corners the difference between the products is 8.

  1. Maths - number grid

    I am now going to repeat my process using a different grid to see what affect, if anything, there will be to the figure 10. I am going to be using a 12x12 square grid and will repeat my processes from chapter one.

  2. Number Stairs

    case from the 10x10 grid can be substituted in to the formula staircase for the 10x10 grid. We can also evaluate that Stair number (n) = 17 By substitution stair total= 17+17+1+17+2+17+3+17+10+17+11+17+12+17+20+17+21+17+30= 280 Now that I have accomplished my investigation on the 10x10 grid with 4 step stair case, I

  1. Mathematics - Number Stairs

    + (n+3) + (n+9) + (n+10) + (n+11) + (n+18) + (n+19) + (n+27) = 10n + 100 8 9 10 11 12 1 T = n T = n T = n T = n T = n 2 T = 3n + 9 T = 3n + 10 T = 3n + 11 T = 3n

  2. number grid

    But this time instead of drawing all the grids I will try to work is out algebraically. I will do this because it will save time and get to the point quicker. Now I will pick out a 3 X 3 grid from a 10 X 10 and examine it

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work