• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month
Page
  1. 1
    1
  2. 2
    2
  3. 3
    3
  4. 4
    4
  5. 5
    5
  6. 6
    6
  7. 7
    7
  8. 8
    8
  9. 9
    9
  10. 10
    10

maths grid coursework

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

Maths coursework

i am going to investigate a pattern by taking a squares and rectangles and multiplying the top corners.

For squares 2x2, 3x3, 4x4, 5x5

for rectangles 2x3,24,2x5,3x2,3x4,3x5,4x2,4x3,4x5

 i will be doing this in a nine squared grid and a ten squared grid  

after my results if there is a pattern i will make a formula to describe the pattern

2x2 squares on 10 squared grid.

16

26        

15

25

16x25=400    400-390=10  

15x26=390

59

60

49

50

59x50=2950  2950-2940=10

49x60=2940

3x3

22

23

24

32

33

34

42

43

44

22x44=968   1008-268=40

24x42=1008

27

28

29

37

38

39

47

48

49

27x49=1323  1363-1323=40

47x29=1363

Algerbraic

equation.

Key

G= grid size

N= number

w= number of squares.

2x2 sqaure on a 10 size grid

n

n+(w-1)

n+g

n+(w-1)+g

3x3 sqaure on a 10 size grid

n

n+(w-2)

n+(w-1)

n+g

n+(w-2)+g

n+(w-1)+g

n+2g

n+(w-2) +2g

n+(w-1)+ 2g

...read more.

Middle

25

21x15=315 315-275=40

11x25=275

3x4

36

37

38

39

46

47

48

49

56

57

58

59

36x59=2124 2184-2124=60

56x39=2184

7

8

9

10

17        

18

19

20

27    

28

29

30

7x30=210   270-210=60

10x27=270

3x5

4

5

6

7

8

14

15

16

17

18

24

25

26

27

28

 4X28=112 192-112=80

8x24=192

61

62

63

64

65

71

72

73

74

75

81

82

83

84

85

61x85=5185 5265-5185=80

81x65=5265

4x2

8

9

18

19

28

29

38

39

8x39=312 342-312=30

9x38=342

4x3

6

8

7

16

17

18

26

27

28

36

37

38

6x38=228   288-228=60

8x36=288

4x5

65

66

67

68

69

75

76

77

78

79

85

86

87

88

89

95

96

97

98

99

99x65=6435  6555-6435=120

95x69=6555

RESULTS

Sides in squares

...read more.

Conclusion

9x24=216

216-162= 54

33x54=1782

36x51=1836

1836-1782=54

3x5

59 x 81=4779

77x63=4851

4851-4779=72

10x32=320

14x28=392

392-320=72

4x2

37x65=2405

38x64=2435

2435-2405=27

39x67=2613

40x66=2640

2640-2613=27

4x3

6x35=210

33x8=264

264-210=54

61x90=5490

63x88=5544

5490-5544=54

4x5

1x32=32

5x28=140

140-32=108

55x86=4730

59x82=4838

4838-4730=108

results

Side in squares

Difference between answers 9 squared

Difference between answers 10 squared

difference

2x3

18

20

2

2x4

27

30

3

2x5

36

40

4

3x2

18

20

2

3x4

54

60

6

3x5

72

80

8

4x2

27

30

3

4x3

54

60

6

4x5

108

120

12

With these results we can say that the formula is when m is the shortest side and n is the  longest side  (m-1)(n-1)x 9

 example 4x5

4= m 5=n   4-1x5-1=3x4=12  12x9=108

if a rectangle had a side of   14x45  14=m 45=n 14-1x45-1=13x44= 572

572 x 9=5148 would be the difference of the corners timed together  

evaluation

i believe i could have improved this experiment by using more resources and different shaped grids such as triangles to test my formula also i should have tested  each grid number  at least 4 times and used different sized grids.

...read more.

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. GCSE Maths Sequences Coursework

    Therefore; Nth term for Shaded = 4N Unshaded To find the amount of unshaded squares all I have to do is subtract the shaded squares from the total amount of squares; 2N�+2N+1-4N = 2N�-2N+1 Conclusion I can now conclude that my formulae are definitely correct as I have made predictions

  2. Staircase Coursework

    So this formula simplified equals: St = 3n + 3g + 1 I Iii# II will now test the formula to see if it works, by looking at stair 16 So if n = 16 and g = 2 3x16 + 3x2 + 1 = 55 And if I add

  1. Mathematics Layers Coursework

    I will use n as the grid size, o as the amount of gaps on the bottom layer and r as the amount of layers. For my example I am going to use grid size four, with two gaps on the bottom row and two layers.

  2. Number Grid Coursework

    79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 89 90 91 92 93 94 95 96 97 98 Fig 2.4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28

  1. algebra coursework

    (X+1) 10 (X-1)� = 10X� - 20X + 10 The formula for a square on a 10 X 10 grid is 10(X-1)� To get the formula 10 (X-1)� I multiplied the corners of the square algebraically then I took away the terms, ending up with 10X� - 20X + 10 which

  2. number grid

    = 2790 2790 - 2300 = 490 The difference between, the product of the top left number and the bottom right number, and the product of the top right number and the bottom left number in an 8 X 8 grid is 490. This proves that my formula is correct.

  1. Mathematical Coursework: 3-step stairs

    59 60 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 4.

  2. number grid

    = n2+33n Stage B: Bottom left number x Top right number = (n+30)(n+3)= n2+3n+30n+90 = n2+33n+90 Stage B - Stage A: (n2+33n+90)-(n2+33n) = 90 When finding the general formula for any number (n), both answers begin with the equation n2+33n, which signifies that they can be manipulated easily.

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work