• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

I'm going to investigate the difference between products on a number grid first I'm going to draw a box round four numbers then I will find the product of top left, bottom right numbers, and then

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

Introduction:

I'm going to investigate the difference between products on a number grid first I'm going to draw a box round four numbers then I will find the product of top left, bottom right numbers, and then I'm going to do the same with the top right, bottom right numbers in the box. I'll will then calculate the difference between these products. Not only I am going to investigate squares, but also rectangles, I'll use algebra to try and find a formula or a general rule that will give me this difference for any size shape.

I'm going to draw a box round four numbers then I will find the product of

...read more.

Middle

76

77

78

85

86

87

88

The difference between 4930 and 4840 is 90 because  4930 - 4840 = 90.

58 x 85 = 4930
55 x 88 = 4840

I predicted that the difference for all 4 by 4 spares will be 90, I'll do another 4 by 4 grid to confirm that my prediction is correct.

51

52

53

54

61

62

63

64

71

72

73

74

81

82

83

84

The difference between 4930 and 4940 is 90 because 4930 - 4940 = 90.

54 x 81 = 4374
51 x 84 = 4284

This shows that my prediction is correct, that all 4 by 4 will equal to 90.

5 by 5


I'm going to draw a box round twenty five numbers then I will find the product of top left, bottom right numbers, and then I'm going to do the same with the top right, bottom right numbers.

1

2

3

4

5

11

12

13

14

15

21

22

23

24

25

31

32

33

34

35

41

42

43

44

45

The difference between 205 and 45 is 160 because 205 - 45 = 160.

5 x 41 = 205
1 x 45 = 45

55

56

57

58

59

65

66

67

68

69

75

76

77

78

79

85

86

87

88

89

95

96

97

98

99

The difference between 5605 and 5445 is 160 because 5605 - 5445 = 160.

59 x 95 = 5605
55 x 99 = 5445

42

43

44

45

46

52

53

54

55

56

62

63

64

65

66

72

73

74

75

76

82

83

84

85

86

The difference between 3772 and 3612 is 160 because 3772 - 3612 = 160.

46 x 82 = 3772
42 x 86 = 3612


I predicted that the difference for all 5 by 5 spares will be 160, I'll do another 5 by 5 grid to confirm that my prediction is correct.

35

36

37

38

39

45

46

47

48

49

55

56

57

58

59

65

66

67

68

59

75

76

77

78

79

...read more.

Conclusion

n>

24

25

26

31

32

33

34

35

36

41

42

43

44

45

46

51

52

53

54

55

56

61

62

63

64

65

66

71

72

73

74

75

76

The difference between 1846 and 1596 is 250 because 1846 - 1596 = 250.

26 x 71 = 1846
21 x 76 = 1596

1

2

3

4

5

6

11

12

13

14

15

16

21

22

23

24

25

26

31

32

33

34

35

36

41

42

43

44

45

46

51

52

53

54

55

56

The difference between 306 and 56 is 250 because 306 - 56 = 250.

6 x 51 = 306
1 x 56 = 56

33

34

35

36

37

38

43

44

45

46

47

48

53

54

55

56

57

58

63

64

65

66

67

68

73

74

75

76

77

78

83

84

85

86

87

88

The difference between 3154 and 2904 is 250 because 3154 - 2904 = 250.

38 x 83 = 3154
33 x 88 = 2904

I predicted that the difference for all 6 by 6 spares will be 250, I'll do another 6 by 6 grid to confirm that my prediction is correct.

14

15

16

17

18

19

24

25

26

27

28

29

34

35

36

37

38

39

44

45

46

47

48

49

54

55

56

57

58

59

64

65

66

67

68

69

The difference between 1216 and 966 is 250 because 1216 - 966 = 250.

19 x 64 = 1216
14 x 69 =   966

...read more.

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Consecutive Numbers section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Consecutive Numbers essays

  1. GCSE Maths Coursework - Maxi Product

    15 (1,14)= 15 --> 1+14 --> 1x14=14 (2,13)= 15 --> 2+13 --> 2x13=26 (3,12)= 15 --> 3+12 --> 3x12=36 (4,11)= 15 --> 4+11 --> 4x11=44 (5,10)= 15 --> 5+10 --> 5x10=50 (6,9)= 15 --> 6+9 --> 6x9 =54 (7,8)= 15 --> 7+8 --> 7x8 =56 I have found that 56

  2. Maxi product

    (6 1/15, 6 14/15)=13 --> 6 1/15+6 14/15 --> 6 1/15x6 14/15=42.06 (2dp) (6 2/13, 6 11/13)=13 --> 6 2/13+6 11/13 --> 6 2/13x6 11/13=42.13 (2dp) I have found that 6.5 and 6.5 are the two numbers which added together make 13 and when multiplied together make 42.25 which is

  1. In this investigation I will explore the relationship between a series of straight, non-parallel, ...

    regions are depicted with numbers, crossover points are high-lighted with red circles) In this diagram there are: Number of Lines (n) Cross-Over Points Open Regions Closed Regions Total Regions 1 0 2 0 2 2 1 4 0 4 3 3 6 1 7 4 6 8 3 11 5

  2. I am to conduct an investigation involving a number grid.

    3 4 11 12 13 14 21 22 23 24 31 32 33 34 [image013.gif] 1 x 34 = 34 31 x 4 = 124 124 - 34 = 90 The difference between the two numbers is 90 Box 3 64 65 66 67 74 75 76 77 84 85

  1. Borders and squares

    Basically I will be subtracting one equation from the equation before it. I will keep on doing this till I get to 2 equations. This way I will be able to find a,b,c,d and e. and then I can go on further to prove the equation.

  2. Investigating a Sequence of Numbers.

    . n = 6, (n + 1)! = 5040; Sn = 5039 According to what I have discovered, Sn can be express mathematically in this way: Sn = 1 x 1!

  1. Number Grid Investigation.

    I thought that if I were to start working out a formula, I should name some of the variables: Side of box

  2. In this investigation I am trying to find a rule for the difference between ...

    For example: 5 Consecutive Numbers 1,2,3,4,5 = 15 3 x 5 = 15 This rule works for both odd and even numbers, as you can see below: 6 Consecutive Numbers 1,2,3,4,5,6 = 21 3.5 x 6 = 21 Algebraic Rules From the results I have collected I have found an

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work