• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month
Page
  1. 1
    1
  2. 2
    2
  3. 3
    3
  4. 4
    4
  5. 5
    5
  6. 6
    6
  7. 7
    7
  8. 8
    8
  9. 9
    9
  10. 10
    10
  11. 11
    11
  12. 12
    12
  13. 13
    13
  14. 14
    14
  15. 15
    15
  16. 16
    16
  17. 17
    17
  18. 18
    18
  • Level: GCSE
  • Subject: Maths
  • Word count: 3793

Number Grid Coursework.

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

Number Grid Coursework 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 89 90 91 92 93 94 95 96 97 98 99 100 Use the following rule: Find the product of the top left number and the bottom right number in the square. Do the same thing with the bottom left and the top right numbers in the square. Calculate the following difference between these numbers. INVESTIGATE! The first thing I'm going to do is work out the rule for a 10 x 10 grid. To do this I'm going to work out what the difference is between each row using 2 x 2, 3 x 3, 4 x 4, and 5 x 5 grids inside the main 10 x 10 one. 10 x 10 grid 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 89 90 91 92 93 94 95 96 97 98 99 100 2 x 2 3 x 3 23 x 14 = 322 33 x 15 = 495 13 x 24 = 312 difference = 10 13 x 35 ...read more.

Middle

627 30 x 39 = 1170 difference = 8 17 x 35 = 595 difference = 32 50 x 43 = 2150 62 x 48 = 2976 42 x 51 = 2142 difference = 8 46 x 64 = 2944 difference = 32 4 x 4 5 x 5 29 x 8 = 232 34 x 6 = 204 5 x 32 = 160 difference = 72 2 x 38 = 76 difference = 128 43 x 22 = 946 60 x 32 = 1920 19 x 46 = 874 difference = 72 28 x 64 = 1792 difference = 128 49 x 28 = 1372 41 x 13 = 533 25 x 52 = 1300 difference = 72 9 x 45 = 405 difference = 128 I can also work out these differences using algebra. 2 x 2 x x + 1 x + 8 x + 9 (x + 8)(x + 1) => x� + 9x + 8 (x)(x + 9) => x� + 9x difference = 8 3 x 3 x x + 1 x + 2 x + 8 x + 9 x + 10 x + 16 x + 17 x + 18 (x + 16)(x + 2) => x� + 18x + 32 (x)(x + 18) => x� + 18x difference = 32 4 x 4 x x + 1 x + 2 x + 3 x + 8 x + 9 x + 10 x + 11 x + 16 x + 17 x + 18 x + 19 x + 24 x + 25 x + 26 x + 27 (x + 24)(x + 3) => x� + 27x +72 (x)(x + 27) => x� + 27x difference = 72 5 x 5 x x + 1 x + 2 x + 3 x + 4 x + 8 x + 9 x + 10 x + 11 x + 12 x + 16 x + 17 x + 18 x + 19 x + 20 ...read more.

Conclusion

91 95 1 x 95 = 95 difference = 360 3 7 93 x 7 = 651 93 97 3 x 97 = 291 difference = 360 Rectangle: 2 x 5 3 x 5 4 x 5 6 x 5 7 x 5 8 x 5 9 x 5 10 x 5 40 80 120 200 240 280 320 360 * 4 8 12 20 24 28 32 36 /\ /\ /\ /\ /\ /\ /\ /\ Multiples: 1 4 2 4 3 4 5 4 6 4 7 4 8 4 9 4 *Here I can remove a factor of 10 from each difference. I can now use these to work out a general rule for rectangle grids on a 10 x 10 grid. 2 x 5 2 = width 5 = length 2 - 1 = 1 5 - 1 = 4 1 and 4 are multiples of 4 which is the difference of a 2 x 5 rectangle with a factor of 10 removed. 3 x 5 3 = width 5 = length 3 - 1 = 2 5 - 1 = 4 2 and 4 are multiples of 8 which is the difference of a 3 x 5 rectangle with a factor of 10 removed. 4 x 5 4 = width 5 = length 4 - 1 = 3 5 - 1 = 4 3 and 4 are multiples of 12 which is the difference of a 4 x 5 rectangle with a factor of 10 removed. Using these I can assume a general rule for finding the difference: (w-1)(l-1) but because I took a factor of 10 out all this would have to be multiplied by 10 10(w-1)(l-1) To show that this works I am going to use rectangles 6 x 5, 7 x 5 and 8 x 5. 6 x 5 10 x 5 x 4 = 200 7 x 5 10 x 6 x 4 = 240 8 x 5 10 x 7 x 4 = 280 ...read more.

The above preview is unformatted text

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. Number Grid Coursework

    Product 2 (TR x BL) Difference (P'duct 2 - P'duct 1) 2 92 252 160 34 2652 2812 160 41 3485 3645 160 52 4992 5152 160 56 5600 5760 160 d) Here are the results of the 5 calculations for 6x6 Box on Width 10 Grid: Top-Left Number Product 1 (TL x BR)

  2. Number Grids Investigation Coursework

    (n - 1) in a grid with differences between the numbers of 1. I have noticed that the number you subtract from m or n is the same as the difference between the numbers on the grid, so I can predict that these are the same, If I use p for the difference

  1. Investigation of diagonal difference.

    To do this I will need to compare previous investigated cutouts and look at the similarities and differences. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32

  2. Maths - number grid

    (12x12 grid) I am again going to start with 2x2 squares randomly selected from my new 12x12 grid. 30x41 - 29x42 1230 - 1218 Difference =12 77x88 - 76x89 6776 - 6764 Difference = 12 I am now confident that any 2x2 square selected from my new 12x12 number grid will give me a defined difference of 12.

  1. algebra coursework

    56 62 63 64 65 66 72 73 74 75 76 32 X 76 = 2432 36 X 72 = 2592 2592 - 2432 = 160 Z Z+4 Z+40 Z+44 Z = top left number = 32 (in this case) Z+4 = 32 + 4 = 36 (top right number)

  2. Number Stairs

    3 step stair case in the 7x7 grid, in order to find out the stair total and to see if the formula works. Stair number=33 Stair total= 33+34+35+40+41+47= 230 But by using the nth term our stair total= (6x33)

  1. number grid

    to see if there is anyway to work out the difference algebraically. 26 27 28 36 37 38 46 47 48 After looking at this grid I have found out that the top right number is two numbers bigger than the top left number, the bottom left number is twenty

  2. Mathematical Coursework: 3-step stairs

    to calculate the 3-step stair by using the basic method of adding: 73+74+75+83+84+93= 482 This proves my theory is correctly, however to guarantee my theory is reliable and accurate I will use a calculator and I will also calculate using another 3-step stair shape of the 10cm by 10cm grid.

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work