• Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month
Page
  1. 1
    1
  2. 2
    2
  3. 3
    3
  4. 4
    4
  5. 5
    5
  6. 6
    6
  7. 7
    7
  8. 8
    8
  9. 9
    9
  10. 10
    10
  11. 11
    11
  12. 12
    12
  13. 13
    13
  14. 14
    14
  15. 15
    15
  16. 16
    16
  17. 17
    17
  • Level: GCSE
  • Subject: Maths
  • Word count: 1987

Number Grids.

Extracts from this document...

Introduction

Number Grids The diagram shows a 10*10 grid, a rectangle has been shaded on the 10*10 grid. I will find the diagonal difference between the products of the numbers in the opposite corners of the rectangle. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 89 90 91 92 93 94 95 96 97 98 99 100 Opposite numbers in the rectangle are:- 54 and 66 56 and 64 56*64=3584 54*66=3564 .�. The Diagonal Difference = 3584 - 3564 = 20 Study I have studied some more 3*2 rectangles and I have found this:- 12 13 14 22 23 24 12*24=288 14*22=308 Diagonal difference =308 - 288=20 74*86=6364 76*84=6384 Diagonal difference =6384 - 6364=20 74 75 76 84 85 86 27*39=1053 29*37=1073 Diagonal difference =1073 - 1053= 20 27 28 29 37 38 39 So from this I conclude that all 3*2 rectangles have a diagonal difference of 20. ...read more.

Middle

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 I will begin by doing some 3*2 rectangles 21*32= 672 23*30=690 Diagonal difference=690 - 672 =18 21 22 23 30 31 32 57*68= 3876 59*66=3894 Diagonal difference=3894 - 3876 =18 57 58 59 66 67 68 So I conclude that all 3*2 squares on a 9*9 grid have a diagonal difference of 18. I have tested the other way by using a 2*3 rectangle. 1*20=20 2*19=38 Diagonal difference = 38 - 20 = 18 1 2 10 11 19 20 40*59=2360 41*58=2378 Diagonal difference = 2378 - 2360 = 18 40 41 49 50 58 59 So all 3*2 and 2*3 squares have a diagonal difference of 18. I will study more rectangles on a 9*9grid and then draw up a table. ...read more.

Conclusion

3*2 rectangle on an 8*8 grid I use my formula to predict that: - (3-1)*(2-1)*8 =2*1*8 =16 2*12=24 4*10=40 Diagonal difference = 40 - 24=16 2 3 4 10 11 12 My prediction is right. So using my formula I predict that a 3*3 square on an 8*8 grid will be (X-1)*(X-1)*8 (3-1)*(3-1)*8 =2*2*8 =32 46*64=2944 48*62=2976 Diagonal difference = 2976 - 2944 =32 46 47 48 54 55 56 62 63 64 So my prediction and formula are also right. A pattern A pattern has shown up in the formulas so I made this table: - Grid rectangle Formula 10*10 (R-1)*(C-1)*10 9*9 (R-1)*(C-1)*9 8*8 (R-1)*(C-1)*8 7*7 (R-1)*(C-1)*7 6*6 (R-1)*(C-1)*6 5*5 (R-1)*(C-1)*5 Grid Square Formula 10*10 (X-1)*(X-1)*10 9*9 (X-1)*(X-1)*9 8*8 (X-1)*(X-1)*8 7*7 (X-1)*(X-1)*7 6*6 (X-1)*(X-1)*6 So on a 6*6 grid I would expect a 3*2 rectangle to be: - (3-1)*(2-1)*6 =2*1*6 =12 So 8*16=128 10*14=140 Diagonal difference = 140 - 128 =12 8 9 10 14 15 16 Also a 3*3 square on a 6*6 grid would be: - (X-1)*(X-1)*6 => (3-1)*(3-1)*6 =2*2*6 =24 3*17=51 5*15=75 Diagonal difference = 75 - 51 =24 3 4 5 9 10 11 15 16 17 Both predictions and formulas are correct so I conclude that the overall formula is: - R= rows C= columns X= square N� G= grid Rectangle: - (R-1)*(C-1)*G ...AND... Square: - (X-1)*(X-1)*G ...read more.

The above preview is unformatted text

This student written piece of work is one of many that can be found in our GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences section.

Found what you're looking for?

  • Start learning 29% faster today
  • 150,000+ documents available
  • Just £6.99 a month

Not the one? Search for your essay title...
  • Join over 1.2 million students every month
  • Accelerate your learning by 29%
  • Unlimited access from just £6.99 per month

See related essaysSee related essays

Related GCSE Number Stairs, Grids and Sequences essays

  1. Investigation of diagonal difference.

    a trend for all of the 2x2 cutouts in a 10x10 grid. From this I will be able to calculate the diagonal difference of a cutout anywhere on the grid, as n is independent of where the cutout is on the grid.

  2. Algebra Investigation - Grid Square and Cube Relationships

    114 115 116 117 118 119 120 121 122 123 124 125 Difference in Cube: Stage A: TF Top Left x BF Bottom Right Stage B: TF Bottom Left x BF Top Right Stage B - Stage A: Difference Difference in Cube: Stage A: = 1 x 125 = 125

  1. Investigate the differences between products in a controlled sized grid.

    1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50

  2. Investigate the diagonal difference of a 2 by 2 grid inside a 10 by ...

    27 28 37 38 27 x 38 = 1026 28 x 37= 1036 Diagonal difference: 1026- 1036 = 10 After doing this, I found out that the diagonal difference of two by two grids was 10 because all the two by two grids gave me an answer of 10.

  1. Number Grids

    55 7 8 9 10 17 18 19 20 27 28 29 30 37 38 39 40 7 8 9 10 17 18 19 20 27 28 29 30 37 38 39 40 The rule for this again is the same, only with minor alterations.

  2. number grid

    n+11 Stage A: Top left number x Bottom right number = n(n+11) = n2+11n Stage B: Bottom left number x Top right number = (n+10)(n+1)= n2+1n+10n+10 = n2+11n+10 Stage B - Stage A: (n2+11n+10)-(n2+11n) = 10 When finding the general formula for any number (n), both answers begin with the equation n2+11n, which signifies that they can be manipulated easily.

  1. Number grids

    47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 77 78 79 80 81 82 83 84 85 86 87 88 89 90 91 92 93 94 95 96

  2. Investigate the difference between the products of the numbers in the opposite corners of ...

    1 2 11 12 1 x 12 = 12 2 x 11 = 22 22 - 12 = 10 45 46 55 56 45 x 56 = 2520 46 x 55 = 2530 2530 - 2520 = 10 89 90 99 100 89 x 100 = 8900 90 x 99

  • Over 160,000 pieces
    of student written work
  • Annotated by
    experienced teachers
  • Ideas and feedback to
    improve your own work